MO HB1637 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires graduates of two-year and four-year institutions of higher education located in Missouri to have successfully completed a three credit hour course in the freedom of speech
Title
Requires graduates of two-year and four-year institutions of higher education located in Missouri to have successfully completed a three credit hour course in the freedom of speech
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1637&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1637I.PDF |