MO HB1575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires children in the City of St. Louis and Kansas City school districts to enroll in a school by the age of five.
Title
Requires children in the City of St. Louis and Kansas City school districts to enroll in a school by the age of five.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1575&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3562H.01I.pdf |