MO HB1560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies powers of St. Louis City and St. Louis City senior citizens’ services fund board of directors.
Title
Modifies powers of St. Louis City and St. Louis City senior citizens’ services fund board of directors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1560&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3985H.01I.pdf |