MO HB1521 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires collectors in all counties, except for counties under township organization, to mail or electronically send property tax bills 30 days before the taxes are delinquent
Title
Requires collectors in all counties, except for counties under township organization, to mail or electronically send property tax bills 30 days before the taxes are delinquent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-17 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |