MO HB1468 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that unpaid volunteers of a tax-exempt veteran's organization are not subject to the Workers' Compensation Law
Title
Specifies that unpaid volunteers of a tax-exempt veteran's organization are not subject to the Workers' Compensation Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-16 | House | House Requests Senate to Recede (H) - Take up and pass HB 1468 |
2014-05-16 | House | House Refuses to Adopt (C) |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Requests House to Take Up and Pass (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House (H) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 23 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate with... (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 12 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |