MO HB1448 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new provisions allowing for the creation of benefit corporations.
Title
Establishes new provisions allowing for the creation of benefit corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Withdrawn (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1448&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3149H.01I.pdf |