MO HB144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relates to decisions regarding health care and health care records
Title
Relates to decisions regarding health care and health care records
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: HB 144 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 2, 2017, 1:00pm, SCR 2 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to decisions regarding health care and health care records |
2017-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |