MO HB1403 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Andrew Jackson Vote Restoration Act which requires certain elections to be held even if the number of candidates filing for a position is equal to the number of positions available
Title
Establishes the Andrew Jackson Vote Restoration Act which requires certain elections to be held even if the number of candidates filing for a position is equal to the number of positions available
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1403&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1403I.htm |