MO HB1395 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 2012 1:30 P.M., SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 001 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2 ADOPTED | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 AS AMENDED PENDING | |
2012-03-27 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |