MO HB1387 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to be excused from compliance with certain statutes in the event of withholding of funds by the governor
Title
Allows school districts to be excused from compliance with certain statutes in the event of withholding of funds by the governor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1387&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4305H.01I.pdf |