MO HB1378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows two or more partnering entities to form a broadband infrastructure improvement district or partnership for the delivery of broadband internet service to the residents of such municipalities or service areas
Title
Allows two or more partnering entities to form a broadband infrastructure improvement district or partnership for the delivery of broadband internet service to the residents of such municipalities or service areas
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |