MO HB1342 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to certificates of need
Title
Repeals provisions relating to certificates of need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |