MO HB1304 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any political subdivision from incurring any indebtedness through the issuance of a bond unless it has been approved by the voters
Title
Prohibits any political subdivision from incurring any indebtedness through the issuance of a bond unless it has been approved by the voters
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability | |
2012-01-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1304&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1304I.htm |