MO HB1269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides immunity from civil liability for persons who render assistance to animals trapped in motor vehicles.
Title
Provides immunity from civil liability for persons who render assistance to animals trapped in motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1269&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3005H.01I.pdf |