MO HB1254 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Title
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. Don Ruzicka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 017 | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-04-25 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-25 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Agriculture Policy (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |