MO HB1216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the joint committee on education to undertake additional duties related to oversight of the state education system
Title
Requires the joint committee on education to undertake additional duties related to oversight of the state education system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1216&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1661H.01I.pdf |