MO HB1216 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on State and Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the State Highway 19 bridge over the Meramec River between the cities of Cuba and Steelville as the "Betty Vickers Memorial Bridge"
Title
Designates the State Highway 19 bridge over the Meramec River between the cities of Cuba and Steelville as the "Betty Vickers Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1216&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB1216I.PDF |