MO HB1216 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum annual grant amount that the University of Missouri Board of Curators can award for a research project on Alzheimer's disease and related disorders
Title
Increases the maximum annual grant amount that the University of Missouri Board of Curators can award for a research project on Alzheimer's disease and related disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Higher Education (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1216&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1216I.htm |