MO HB1179 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding sales and use taxes and the motor fuel tax and authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on the sale of a used manufactured home
Title
Changes the laws regarding sales and use taxes and the motor fuel tax and authorizes a sales and use tax exemption on the sale of a used manufactured home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 26 |
2014-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 3 adopted |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |