MO HB1176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Authorized Electronic Monitoring in Long-Term Care Facilities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-11HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-04-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-10HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-03-28HouseRe-referred to Committee: Special Committee on Aging(H)
2019-03-12HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2019-03-01HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback