MO HB1169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the investigation of a report of child abuse that arises from a spanking in a school
Title
Changes the laws regarding the investigation of a report of child abuse that arises from a spanking in a school
Sponsors
Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Education (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 001 | |
2012-03-28 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |