MO HB107 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes "Toby's Law," which requires any person who has pled guilty to or been found guilty of driving while intoxicated to complete a victim impact program approved by the court

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Toby's Law," which requires any person who has pled guilty to or been found guilty of driving while intoxicated to complete a victim impact program approved by the court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-10HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback