MO HB1068 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preempts any laws or orders that would hinder the operations of a firearm business

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preempts any laws or orders that would hinder the operations of a firearm business

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-04-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-02-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback