MO HB1055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding initiative petitions.
Title
Changes the law regarding initiative petitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1055&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2206H.01I.pdf |