MO HB1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Title
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-04-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-04-20 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Appropriations (S) | |
2011-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-30 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-29 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-03-29 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-29 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |