MN SF958 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus agriculture finance and policy bill
Title
Omnibus agriculture finance and policy bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: S.F. NO. 958 (Y: 79 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: S.F. NO. 958 (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: S.F. NO. 958 (Y: 79 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: S.F. NO. 958 (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 28 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2021-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2021-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House conferees Sundin; Vang; Pelowski; Lippert; Nelson, N. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate conferees Westrom; Dornink; Goggin; Anderson; Murphy |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | House conferees Sundin; Vang; Pelowski; Lippert; Nelson, N. |
2021-04-22 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2021-04-22 | House | Senate conferees Westrom, Dornink, Goggin, Anderson, Murphy |
2021-04-22 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-22 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-22 | House | Amended |
2021-04-22 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-04-22 | House | Motion to take from table |
2021-04-21 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-04-21 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported to the House |
2021-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-16 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-15 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1524 |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1524 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed