MN SF3789 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - Author added Dibble
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Juneteenth as a state holiday designation
Title
Juneteenth as a state holiday designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added Kent |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3910 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Second reading