MN SF3511 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author stricken Eaton
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author stricken Eaton
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parks and trails fund grants requirements modification and proposal requirements
Title
Parks and trails fund grants requirements modification and proposal requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Author stricken Eaton |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Author added Eaton |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2703 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Author stricken Heintzeman