MN HF2703 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author stricken Heintzeman
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author stricken Heintzeman
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parks and trails fund grant requirements modified.
Title
Parks and trails fund grant requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Author stricken Heintzeman |
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Edelson |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Her |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Hausman |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Hansen |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF3511 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author stricken Eaton