MN SF3397 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refundable credit provision and appropriation for investments in energy efficient home improvements, electric vehicles and renewable energy
Title
Refundable credit provision and appropriation for investments in energy efficient home improvements, electric vehicles and renewable energy
Sponsors
Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3320 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Author added Her