MN HF3320 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Her
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Her
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy; refundable tax credit provided for investments in energy efficient home improvements, electric vehicles, and renewable energy; and money appropriated.
Title
Energy; refundable tax credit provided for investments in energy efficient home improvements, electric vehicles, and renewable energy; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Her |
2022-02-15 | House | Author added Long |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3397 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration