MN SF2934 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Environment and natural resources trust fund appropriation; previous appropriations modifications; recipients of environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriations requirements modifications; wastewater treatment projects appropriation bonds issuance, wastewater treatment grant funding provisions modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and natural resources trust fund appropriation; previous appropriations modifications; recipients of environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriations requirements modifications; wastewater treatment projects appropriation bonds issuance, wastewater treatment grant funding provisions modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateSecond reading
2018-05-15SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2018-03-29SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2018-03-05SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3352 (Similar To) 2018-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback