MN SF1291 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility amendment for a veteran designation on drivers' or Minnesota identification cards
Title
Eligibility amendment for a veteran designation on drivers' or Minnesota identification cards
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF720 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy