MN SF1012 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources appropriations; legislative-citizen commission on Minnesota resources (LCCMR) funding recommendation duties modifications
Title
Environment and natural resources appropriations; legislative-citizen commission on Minnesota resources (LCCMR) funding recommendation duties modifications
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Sen. Satveer Chaudhary [D] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Sen. Patricia Pariseau [R] |
Sen. James Vickerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-17 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-17 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-17 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2009-05-17 | House: Conference committee report | |
2009-05-17 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: House conferees Wagenius; Knuth; Kath; Persell; Loon | |
2009-05-15 | House: House conferees Wagenius, Knuth, Kath, Persell, Loon | |
2009-05-15 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed | |
2009-05-15 | House: Senate conferees Anderson, Frederickson, Vickerman, Chaudhary, Pariseau | |
2009-05-15 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-14 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-05-14 | House: Third reading | |
2009-05-14 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Senate conferees Anderson; Frederickson; Vickerman; Chaudhary; Pariseau | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2009-05-12 | House: Second reading | |
2009-05-12 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-05-11 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2009-04-27 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-04-06 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-04-06 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-04-06 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-06 | House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division | |
2009-04-02 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-02-26 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-26 | Senate: Referred to Finance |