MN HF990 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential mortgage originators licensing requirements exemption added, and conformity with federal truth in lending requirements provided.
Title
Residential mortgage originators licensing requirements exemption added, and conformity with federal truth in lending requirements provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 990 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 58 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-19 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-05-19 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF934 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF934, now on General Orders |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF934 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF990