MN SF934 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF990
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF990
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential mortgage originators licensing requirement exemption establishment; federal truth in lending requirements conformity authorization
Title
Residential mortgage originators licensing requirement exemption establishment; federal truth in lending requirements conformity authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF990 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF990 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 58