MN HF332 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Author stricken Anderson, P.
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Author stricken Anderson, P.
Pending: House Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State-owned land acreage net increase prohibited.
Title
State-owned land acreage net increase prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House | Author stricken Anderson, P. |
2011-02-28 | House | Author stricken Gruenhagen |
2011-02-17 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2011-02-07 | House | Author added Anderson, P. |
2011-02-03 | House | Author added Westrom |
2011-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0332&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF332&version=0&session=ls87 |