MN HF2970 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grand Rapids Central School Commission creation authorization repealed.
Title
Grand Rapids Central School Commission creation authorization repealed.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-25 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2608 |
2014-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |