MN HF2771 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Organic Advisory Task Force extended, agriculture commissioner required to consult the Minnesota Organic Advisory Task Force and provide recommendations to the legislature, and report required.
Title
Minnesota Organic Advisory Task Force extended, agriculture commissioner required to consult the Minnesota Organic Advisory Task Force and provide recommendations to the legislature, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Yvonne Selcer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Second reading |
2016-04-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2016-03-30 | House | Author added Selcer. |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3201 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development