MN HF2152 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

End-of-life option for terminally ill adults established, and criminal penalties imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End-of-life option for terminally ill adults established, and criminal penalties imposed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Mahoney
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Huot and Lippert
2019-03-11HouseAuthors added Her, Elkins, and Long
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2286 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback