MN HF2124 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Authors added Boldon, Freiberg, Bierman, Her, Moller, Jordan, Lillie, Hornstein, Wolgamott and Olson, L.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Authors added Boldon, Freiberg, Bierman, Her, Moller, Jordan, Lillie, Hornstein, Wolgamott and Olson, L.
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office for missing and murdered indigenous relatives created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Office for missing and murdered indigenous relatives created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Authors added Boldon, Freiberg, Bierman, Her, Moller, Jordan, Lillie, Hornstein, Wolgamott and Olson, L. |
2021-04-22 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Mariani |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-17 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1989 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Author added Marty