MN SF1989 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Author added Marty
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office for missing and murdered indigenous relatives office creation and appropriation
Title
Office for missing and murdered indigenous relatives office creation and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2124 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Authors added Boldon, Freiberg, Bierman, Her, Moller, Jordan, Lillie, Hornstein, Wolgamott and Olson, L.