MN HF2091 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Private and public employee labor standards provided, minimum wage regulated, and state employee use of donated vacation leave regulated.
Title
Private and public employee labor standards provided, minimum wage regulated, and state employee use of donated vacation leave regulated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 71 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: Winkler - Motion to Concur (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House: Winkler - Motion to Concur (Y: 71 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 166 04/14/14 | |
2014-04-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-04-14 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-04-14 | Governor approval | |
2014-04-10 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-04-10 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 71-60 |
2014-04-10 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 71-59 |
2014-04-10 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 35-31 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-09 | House | Author added Winkler (as chief) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-04-08 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-03-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2014-03-24 | House | Third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1775 (Similar To) 2014-04-07 - HF substituted in committee HF2091