MN HF1952 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus state government finance bill.
Title
Omnibus state government finance bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1952 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 61 - Amendment to Lucero Amendment - Nays (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 73 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 56 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 0 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1952 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 61 - Amendment to Lucero Amendment - Nays (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 73 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 56 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 0 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-16 - House - House: 66 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 31 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2021-05-17 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2021-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2021-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2021-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Lang; Koran; Howe; Carlson |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Lang; Koran; Howe; Carlson |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | House conferees Nelson, M.; Xiong, T; Masin; Greenman; Nash |
2021-04-28 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-27 | House | House conferees Nelson, M.; Xiong, T.; Masin; Greenman; Nash |
2021-04-27 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1831 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1831 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-16 | House | Point of order raised multiple points of order |
2021-04-16 | House | Amended |
2021-04-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF1831 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1952