MN SF1831 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1952
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1952
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus state government policy and finance bill
Title
Omnibus state government policy and finance bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1952 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Lang |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1952 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 31