MN HF1749 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Authors added Virnig and Anderson, P. E.
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Authors added Virnig and Anderson, P. E.
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certified public accountants; required education and experience standards amended.
Title
Certified public accountants; required education and experience standards amended.
Sponsors
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] | Rep. Patti Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Virnig and Anderson, P. E. |
2024-02-29 | House | Authors added Robbins and Elkins |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1660 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Author added Maye Quade