MN HF1583 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contact tracing, digital contact tracing, immunizations, communicable disease testing and information disclosure limits established; data destruction required; mandatory employer digital contact tracing prohibited; and civil penalties provided.
Title
Contact tracing, digital contact tracing, immunizations, communicable disease testing and information disclosure limits established; data destruction required; mandatory employer digital contact tracing prohibited; and civil penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Robbins |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1589 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Third reading Passed