MN SF1589 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Communicable diseases contact tracing, digital contact tracing, immunizations, and required disclosures limits establishment; data destruction requirement; employer mandatory digital contact tracing prohibition; civil penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable diseases contact tracing, digital contact tracing, immunizations, and required disclosures limits establishment; data destruction requirement; employer mandatory digital contact tracing prohibition; civil penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateThird reading Passed
2021-05-14SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-05-13SenateSecond reading
2021-05-13SenateComm report: To pass
2021-05-10SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
2021-04-07SenateAuthors added Johnson; Ruud
2021-04-06SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2021-04-06SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
2021-03-01SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-03-01SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1583 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Robbins

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback