MN HF1569 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Davids.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Davids.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic voting system provisions modified, and alternative printed ballot styles permitted.
Title
Electronic voting system provisions modified, and alternative printed ballot styles permitted.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Davids. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-03-09 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1141 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Author added Miller