MN HF15 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 5th Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Notary public; video conferencing permitted to fulfill the requirement to personally appear before a notarial officer for certain conveyances.
Title
Notary public; video conferencing permitted to fulfill the requirement to personally appear before a notarial officer for certain conveyances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House: MOTIONS AND RESOLUTIONS (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 4 | |
2020-10-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-10-21 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-10-21 | Governor approval | |
2020-10-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended vote: 67-0 |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-10-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-10-12 | House | Third reading |
2020-10-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-10-12 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-10-12 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-10-12 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-10-12 | House | Motion to recall |
2020-10-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF4 (Similar To) 2020-10-12 - Laid on table